+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On April 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
On March 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
On March 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and J., E.D., & E.
On February 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 17, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
April 11, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Jobs, Economic Development, and the Economy]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor