+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 105, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
On June 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On June 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 2. Page 4975.).
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12).
On May 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 0. Page 5159.)
On May 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 2).
- Coauthors revised.
On March 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On February 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
June 28, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2969 Low et al. By Lara
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 6
May 14, 2018: AB 2969 LOW Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 19
May 2, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor