+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On September 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 444, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 4940.).
On June 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 12, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 4655.)
On May 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 4, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 4).
On April 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 9, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee April 8.
On March 8, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (5)
August 22, 2022: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2959 JUD. (Stone) By Wieckowski
- Yeas: 40
June 8, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 4
May 12, 2022: AB 2959 JUD. Assembly Third Reading By STONE
- Yeas: 65
- Present/NV: 13
May 4, 2022: Do pass.
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 2
April 19, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor