+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On August 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 196, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6210.).
On August 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5163.).
On July 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 2).
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13).
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5217.)
On May 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 9).
On April 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 10).
On March 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 9, 2018: AB 2941 BERMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
August 6, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2941 Berman By Dodd
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
July 2, 2018: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
June 13, 2018: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
May 17, 2018: AB 2941 BERMAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 5
May 9, 2018: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 10, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor