+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On September 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 397, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5447.).
On August 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 13).
On August 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On May 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5006.)
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 25).
On April 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On April 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 2).
On March 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On February 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 20, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2938 Bloom By Allen
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 13, 2018: Do pass
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
August 8, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
May 3, 2018: AB 2938 BLOOM Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 71
- Present/NV: 7
April 25, 2018: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 2, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor