+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on EQ.
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 0. Page 5536.)
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 25).
On May 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 24).
On April 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On March 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On March 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
On March 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
On February 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 6, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 20, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
May 30, 2018: AB 2934 STONE Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 18
May 25, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 4
April 24, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
April 2, 2018: Be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor