+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On September 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 440, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6502.).
On August 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5443.).
On August 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on EQ.
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5217.)
On May 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 9).
On April 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On March 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On March 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and NAT. RES.
On February 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 23, 2018: AB 2928 CHEN Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
August 20, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2928 Chen By Stone
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
June 20, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
May 17, 2018: AB 2928 CHEN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 5
May 9, 2018: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 23, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 10
April 10, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor