+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On April 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On April 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
On March 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On February 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor