+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 1918.)
On June 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 28).
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
On April 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 25).
On March 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On February 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
On February 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 17, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 8, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
July 8, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
June 4, 2015: AB 292 SANTIAGO Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 2
May 28, 2015: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
March 25, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 25, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor