+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (25)
On October 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 489, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 20. Page 3103.).
On September 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 2496.).
On August 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 20).
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 17. Page 1655.)
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (May 2).
On March 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On March 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On March 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (March 21).
On March 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On March 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
On February 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on JUD. and P. & C.P.
On February 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
On February 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
September 11, 2017: AB 291 CHIU Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 3
September 6, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading AB291 Chiu et al. By Lara
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
June 20, 2017: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 22, 2017: AB 291 CHIU Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 9
May 2, 2017: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
March 21, 2017: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor