+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4688.)
On April 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 27).
On April 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on U. & C.
On March 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee April 3.
On March 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
June 13, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
May 5, 2016: AB 2903 U. & C. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
April 27, 2016: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 19
- Present/NV: 1
April 13, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor