+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 853.)
On April 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On March 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 24).
On March 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On January 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On December 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
On December 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 9, 2015: AB 29 CAMPOS Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
March 24, 2015: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor