+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On September 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 395, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6377.).
On August 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5292.).
On August 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 26).
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5219.)
On May 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 9).
On March 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On February 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 20, 2018: AB 2898 GLORIA Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
August 13, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2898 Gloria By McGuire
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
June 26, 2018: Do pass
- Yeas: 13
May 17, 2018: AB 2898 GLORIA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 5
May 9, 2018: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor