+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5538.)
On May 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
On May 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On February 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 6, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 27, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
May 30, 2018: AB 2892 QUIRK Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
May 25, 2018: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 10, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Quirk
Type:
Primary Sponsor