+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (20)
On July 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 129, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
On June 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On June 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4573.).
On June 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 22).
On June 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On May 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4820.)
On May 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4568.)
On May 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 27).
On April 20, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On April 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
On March 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On March 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On February 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Votes (4)
June 30, 2022: Consent Calendar AB2890
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
June 22, 2022: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 5
May 23, 2022: AB 2890 Bloom Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 5
April 27, 2022: Do pass.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor