+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Died on Senate inactive file.
On August 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Roth.
On June 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From Consent Calendar.
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 22).
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on INS.
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4360.)
On April 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 6).
On March 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on INS.
On February 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
On February 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
June 22, 2016: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
April 14, 2016: AB 2885 INS. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
April 6, 2016: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Insurance
Type:
Primary Sponsor