+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On November 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On May 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
On May 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26).
On April 21, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 20, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On April 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Vote
April 26, 2022: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7