+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (33)
On September 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 826, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On August 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 7011.).
On August 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5954.).
On August 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- Ordered to third reading.
- Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly.
On August 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Held at Desk.
On August 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to the Senate.
On August 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5291.).
On August 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From Consent Calendar.
On July 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On July 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
On May 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5006.)
On April 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 25).
On April 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 30, 2018: AB 2878 CHÁVEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
August 13, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2878 Chávez et al. By Wilk
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
June 13, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
May 3, 2018: AB 2878 CHÁVEZ Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 71
- Present/NV: 7
April 25, 2018: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 11, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor