+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (29)
On November 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Died on unfinished business file, concurrence pending.
On August 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 5599.).
- Ordered to third reading.
- (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 5586.)
- Withdrawn from committee.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Senate Rule 29.3 (b) suspended. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 5583.)
On August 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On August 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Page 5168.)
- Reconsideration granted. (Page 5168.)
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5205.)
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 5168.)
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5205.)
On May 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Mark Stone.
- Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 10. Noes 50. Page 5008.).
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4944.)
On April 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 26).
On April 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On March 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
On February 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
August 31, 2016: W/O REF. TO FILE AB2878 Committee on JUD. By Jackson
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 1
May 31, 2016: AB 2878 JUD. Assembly Third Reading By STONE
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 50
- Present/NV: 20
April 26, 2016: Do pass.
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor