+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On September 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 264, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On September 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2388.).
On August 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26).
On July 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 1715.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 27, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1595.)
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
On May 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Coauthors revised.
On March 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On March 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 23).
On January 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on JUD. and B. & P.
On January 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 21.
On January 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (8)
+ − Votes (8)
September 3, 2021: Special Consent AB287
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
July 15, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 29, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
June 21, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 3
May 27, 2021: AB 287 Quirk Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
May 20, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
April 20, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 19
March 23, 2021: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor