+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 5498.)
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25).
On May 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
On February 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
May 30, 2018: AB 2868 SANTIAGO Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 1
May 25, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
April 18, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor