+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (22)
On September 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 825, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 9. Page 6376.).
On August 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 4. Page 5293.).
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 12).
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 1. Page 4932.)
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4820.)
On April 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 10).
On April 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On April 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 20, 2018: AB 2867 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 11
August 13, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2867 Gonzalez Fletcher By Lara
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 7
June 12, 2018: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
April 30, 2018: AB 2867 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 18
April 10, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor