+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (29)
On September 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 501, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On August 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 49. Noes 29. Page 7034.).
On August 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 5990.).
On August 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
On August 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 5.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on T. & H.
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 28. Page 5505.)
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25).
On May 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On April 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
On March 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On March 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On February 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 30, 2018: AB 2865 CHIU Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 29
- Present/NV: 2
August 29, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2865 Chiu By Wiener
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 2
August 13, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 26, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
May 30, 2018: AB 2865 CHIU Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 28
- Present/NV: 1
May 25, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
April 23, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor