+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On September 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 311, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5592.).
On August 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 16).
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5537.)
On May 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25).
On May 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On April 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On April 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
On March 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On February 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 22, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2864 Limón By Skinner
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 16, 2018: Do pass
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
August 6, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 26, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
May 30, 2018: AB 2864 LIMÓN Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 72
- Present/NV: 6
May 25, 2018: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
May 25, 2018: Do pass" style="text-align:left"> No Votes Recorded: Brough
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
April 9, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor