+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On June 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on EQ.
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4729.)
On June 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 2, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2).
On May 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 5, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On May 4, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
On April 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On February 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 22, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 21, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
June 8, 2020: AB 2849 Chau Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
June 2, 2020: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 18
May 14, 2020: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor