+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (28)
On September 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On August 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:30 p.m.
On August 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 56. Noes 16. Page 6114.)
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 6145.).
On August 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 5019.).
On August 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On August 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On June 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
On May 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 18.)
On May 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 19).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
On April 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 21, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 20, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (April 20).
On April 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on INS.
On April 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
On March 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on INS. and REV. & TAX.
On February 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (8)
August 24, 2022: AB 2847 Eduardo Garcia Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 6
August 23, 2022: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2847 Eduardo Garcia et al By Durazo
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 9
August 1, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 28, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
June 22, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
May 26, 2022: AB 2847 Eduardo Garcia Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 4
May 19, 2022: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
April 20, 2022: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor