+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (28)
On September 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 621, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On August 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6203.).
On August 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 3. Page 5126.).
On August 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 11).
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 4961.)
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 18).
On April 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 20).
On April 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On April 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On March 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 24, 2016: AB 2845 WILLIAMS Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
August 18, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2845 Williams By Pan
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
August 11, 2016: Do pass
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
August 1, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 15, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
May 27, 2016: AB 2845 WILLIAMS Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 67
- Present/NV: 13
May 18, 2016: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 20
April 20, 2016: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor