+ − Summaries (11)
+ − Full Texts (11)
+ − Actions (38)
On September 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 581, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
On August 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 69. Noes 1. Page 6445.).
On August 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 1. Page 5367.).
On August 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (August 11).
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 11).
- In committee: Reconsideration of a favorable vote granted.
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 0. Page 5212.)
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 27).
On May 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 19).
On April 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On April 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
On April 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On March 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On March 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On March 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
- Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On March 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On February 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (11)
August 30, 2016: AB 2844 BLOOM Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 10
August 24, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2844 Bloom By Block
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
August 11, 2016: [08-11-2016] set for [First] hearing: Reconsideration of favorable vote granted
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
August 1, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 28, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
June 2, 2016: AB 2844 BLOOM Assembly Third Reading Motion to Suspend the Rules By ALLEN
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 50
- Present/NV: 4
June 2, 2016: AB 2844 BLOOM Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 64
- Present/NV: 16
May 27, 2016: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 9
April 19, 2016: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
April 13, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
April 4, 2016: Be re-referred to the Committee on [Accountability and Administrative Review]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor