+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (28)
On September 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 590, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
On August 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5940.).
On August 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
On August 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5496.)
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
On May 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 18).
On April 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
On April 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended.
On April 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
- Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
On March 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on U. & E.
On February 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 29, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2831 Limón By Hueso
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 6, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 19, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
May 30, 2018: AB 2831 LIMÓN Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
May 25, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 18, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor