+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On November 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On May 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
On April 21, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 20, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 19).
On April 7, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On April 6, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
On March 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On February 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Vote
April 19, 2022: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Low
Type:
Primary Sponsor