+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On April 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On February 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
April 4, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 19
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Gray
Type:
Primary Sponsor