+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (34)
On September 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 701, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
On August 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6301.).
On August 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5228.).
On August 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 5120.)
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 5141.)
On May 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 27).
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4943.)
On May 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On May 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 9).
On May 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
On May 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On May 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
On March 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On March 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
On March 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On February 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 25, 2016: AB 2818 CHIU Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
August 22, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2818 Chiu By Allen
- Yeas: 39
August 11, 2016: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
August 1, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 29, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 1, 2016: AB 2818 CHIU Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 80
May 27, 2016: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 6
May 9, 2016: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor