+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (23)
On September 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 829, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 2. Page 6038.).
On August 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4960.).
On August 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on ED. and APPR.
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 4893.)
On May 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4853.)
On May 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 4).
On April 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On April 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On March 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 22, 2016: AB 2815 O'DONNELL Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 4
August 15, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2815 O'Donnell By Hancock
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
June 15, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
May 23, 2016: AB 2815 O'DONNELL Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
May 4, 2016: Do pass.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor