+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On September 13, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On August 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 4983.).
On August 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On August 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On June 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- 6-23-2022 hearing rescheduled by committee to 6-22-2022.
On June 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4872.)
On May 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 19).
On April 6, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
On March 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Coauthors revised.
On March 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (6)
August 23, 2022: Special Consent AB2814
- Yeas: 40
August 1, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 22, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 23, 2022: AB 2814 Wood Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 5
May 19, 2022: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
March 23, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor