+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On September 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 646, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
On August 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6200.).
On August 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5130.).
On June 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4776.)
On May 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 4).
On April 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On April 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
On March 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On February 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 24, 2016: AB 2813 BLOOM Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
August 18, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2813 Bloom By Hancock
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 4
June 14, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
May 12, 2016: AB 2813 BLOOM Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
May 4, 2016: Do pass.
- Yeas: 20
April 12, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor