+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On April 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a).
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On March 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and U. & E.
On January 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 28.
On January 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor