+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (26)
On October 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 740, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3156.).
On September 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2716.).
On September 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 17).
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 15).
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1447.)
On May 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 6).
On April 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 21).
On February 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B. & P.
On February 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
On February 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (10)
September 11, 2015: AB 281 GALLAGHER Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
September 10, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB281 Gallagher By Bates
- Yeas: 40
August 17, 2015: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
June 15, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
June 15, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
May 14, 2015: AB 281 GALLAGHER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
May 14, 2015: AB 281 GALLAGHER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
May 6, 2015: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 21, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14
April 21, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor