+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (26)
On September 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 118, Statutes of 2020.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 15, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 31, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 10. Page 5421.).
On August 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 7.).
On August 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 20).
On August 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (August 5).
On July 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On June 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 10, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 15. Page 4793.)
On June 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 4, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On June 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (June 3).
On June 2, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (May 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 5, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On March 4, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
On March 2, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On February 21, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 20, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 31, 2020: AB 2800 Quirk Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 6
August 30, 2020: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2800 Quirk et al. By Caballero
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 1
August 20, 2020: Do pass
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
August 13, 2020: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
August 5, 2020: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
June 10, 2020: AB 2800 Quirk Assembly Third Reading By CHAU
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 2
June 3, 2020: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 5
May 13, 2020: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Gonzalez
Type:
Primary Sponsor