+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (29)
On October 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 698, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On September 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3283.).
- Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Page 3254.)
On September 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 2708.).
On September 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
On August 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On July 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 10).
On July 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1616.)
On May 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 10).
On May 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On March 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On March 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
On February 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On February 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
On February 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
September 13, 2017: AB 280 LOW Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
September 11, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading AB280 Low et al. By Leyva
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
July 10, 2017: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
June 21, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
May 18, 2017: AB 280 LOW Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 69
- Present/NV: 11
May 10, 2017: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
March 13, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10