+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 83, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On June 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On June 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4879.).
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12).
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5043.)
On May 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 1).
On April 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On March 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
June 25, 2018: Consent Calendar AB2792
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 3
June 12, 2018: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
May 7, 2018: AB 2792 CALDERON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 72
- Present/NV: 6
May 1, 2018: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor