+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On September 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On August 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5550.).
On August 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on V.A. and JUD.
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5494.)
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
On May 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On April 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
On April 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On March 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on V.A. and A. & A.R.
On February 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 21, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2790 Irwin By Roth
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 6, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 26, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
June 12, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
May 30, 2018: AB 2790 IRWIN Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 1
May 25, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 25, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
April 10, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Accountability and Administrative Review]
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor