+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (27)
On February 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
On January 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
On October 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 2560.).
On August 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 3. Page 2093.).
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 15).
On July 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 23).
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 1. Page 1404.).
On April 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 28).
On April 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (April 13).
On March 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
On January 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On January 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 21.
On January 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (6)
August 30, 2021: AB 279 Muratsuchi Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 17
August 23, 2021: Assembly 3rd Reading AB279 Muratsuchi et al. By Durazo Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 5
June 23, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
May 13, 2021: AB 279 Muratsuchi Third Reading Urgency
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 19
April 28, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
April 13, 2021: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor