+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On September 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 589, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
On August 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6840.).
On August 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5818.).
On August 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
On July 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5216.)
On May 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 9).
On April 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On April 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 29, 2018: AB 2783 O'DONNELL Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
August 27, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2783 O'Donnell By Bates
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 16, 2018: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
July 2, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 12, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
May 17, 2018: AB 2783 O'DONNELL Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 5
May 9, 2018: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 17, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor