+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (23)
On August 31, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 35, Statutes of 2020.
- Approved by the Governor.
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 p.m.
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 47. Noes 16. Page 5451.).
On August 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 11.).
On August 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On August 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (August 13).
On August 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On July 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On July 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 10, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 20. Page 4755.)
On June 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 2, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (June 2).
On May 21, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (May 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 12, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On February 21, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 20, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 31, 2020: AB 2782 Mark Stone Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 16
August 30, 2020: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2782 Mark Stone et al. By Umberg
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
August 13, 2020: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
June 10, 2020: AB 2782 Mark Stone Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 8
June 2, 2020: Do pass.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 5
May 20, 2020: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2