+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On August 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 178, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
On August 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6139.).
On July 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On July 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5037.).
On June 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19).
On June 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5042.)
On May 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 1).
On April 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On March 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 6, 2018: AB 2780 BLOOM Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
July 2, 2018: Consent Calendar AB2780
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
June 19, 2018: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
May 7, 2018: AB 2780 BLOOM Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 72
- Present/NV: 6
May 1, 2018: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor