+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On September 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 699, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
On August 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 50. Noes 28. Page 6551.).
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6544.)
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (August 30).
On August 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On August 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 5048.).
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 26. Page 4955.)
On May 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (May 18).
On May 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On April 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 8.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On February 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
August 31, 2016: AB 2770 NAZARIAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 28
- Present/NV: 2
August 30, 2016: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 4
August 17, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2770 Nazarian By Beall
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
August 11, 2016: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
August 1, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 27, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
May 27, 2016: AB 2770 NAZARIAN Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 10
May 18, 2016: Do pass.
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 6
April 20, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor