+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On October 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 438, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
On September 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On September 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2907.).
On September 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On September 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
On July 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on EQ.
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1811.)
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26).
On April 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On March 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On March 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Coauthors revised.
On March 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
On March 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended.
On February 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
On February 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended.
On February 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
On February 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 4.
On February 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
September 14, 2017: Special Consent Calendar # AB277
- Yeas: 40
July 10, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 21, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 30, 2017: AB 277 MATHIS Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
May 26, 2017: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
March 21, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor