+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (26)
On September 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 324, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6501.).
On August 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5456.).
On August 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 18).
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 5254.)
On May 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 16).
On April 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 17).
On April 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On April 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
On March 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and HEALTH.
On February 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 23, 2018: AB 2760 WOOD Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
August 20, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2760 Wood By Hernandez
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
June 18, 2018: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
May 21, 2018: AB 2760 WOOD Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 70
- Present/NV: 8
May 16, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
April 17, 2018: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 15
April 10, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health]
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor