+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (41)
On September 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 62, Statutes of 2020.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On August 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5378.).
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 30).
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5274.)
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On August 28, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4380.).
On August 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 20).
On August 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On July 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
On June 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On January 27, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 3890.)
On January 23, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (January 23).
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On January 16, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 15, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 6, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on ED. Re-referred. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (January 6). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On April 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On March 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On February 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On January 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 28.
On January 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
August 30, 2020: AB 276 Friedman Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 4
August 30, 2020: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 11
August 28, 2020: Special Consent AB276
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 13, 2020: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 29, 2020: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
January 27, 2020: AB 276 Friedman Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 6
January 23, 2020: Do pass.
- Yeas: 18
January 15, 2020: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
January 6, 2020: Be re-referred to the Committee on [Education]
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor