+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 38. Noes 35. Page 5218.).
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 45. Noes 28. Page 5207.)
- Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 5207.)
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 5166.)
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (May 27).
On April 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
On March 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
On March 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. & E.
On February 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
June 2, 2016: AB 2757 GONZALEZ Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 35
- Present/NV: 7
June 2, 2016: AB 2757 GONZALEZ Assembly Third Reading Amend By GONZALEZ Set #1
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 28
- Present/NV: 7
May 27, 2016: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 6
April 6, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor